U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00148
  • Case Name: Anderson v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order]
  • March 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 06, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 29, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • July 06, 2017: [1-Exparte Document-to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 07, 2017: [Receipt]
  • April 07, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.