U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00152
  • Case Name: Medina-Munguia v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Return Mail]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 07, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • August 07, 2018: [Response (generic)]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 25, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • April 07, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.