U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Floyd v. Ada County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 27, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Response (generic)]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Supplement]
  • September 26, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2019: [Supplement]
  • September 13, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2019: [Statement]
  • September 13, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 03, 2019: [Withdraw]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Stay]
  • August 23, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 23, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 20, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 20, 2019: [Seal]
  • August 20, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 19, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 19, 2019: [Letter]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Letter]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 21, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2019: [Letter]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • March 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Letter]
  • February 13, 2019: [Letter]
  • February 13, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 13, 2019: [Return Mail]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 23, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • January 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • December 18, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 12, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 13, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • July 11, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 23, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
  • February 02, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 05, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 20, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 27, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • June 21, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 19, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 16, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 09, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 06, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 23, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 19, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 07, 2017: [Complaint]
  • April 07, 2017: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.