U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Miller v. Buicko et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 03, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2017: [Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 16, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 15, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 05, 2017: [Errata]
  • June 05, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 30, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 05, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 10, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.