U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Perry v. Credit Bureau of Lewiston-Clarkston, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Order]
  • July 21, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 21, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 10, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 10, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 07, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 08, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order]
  • April 24, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 10, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.