U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00156
  • Case Name: Hansen v. Tilden Transport, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 14, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Order]
  • October 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 06, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 04, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 13, 2017: [Litigation Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 27, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 18, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 18, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Status Report]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 12, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.