U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00158
  • Case Name: Black v. State of Ohio et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Letter]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 21, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Supplement]
  • April 24, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 14, 2017: [Complaint]
  • April 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.