U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00160
  • Case Name: Brown et al v. Yordy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Settlement]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 13, 2019: [Strike]
  • December 13, 2019: [Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 21, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 19, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 19, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Renew]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 31, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 31, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 16, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 16, 2019: [Seal Document]
  • October 16, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 15, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: [Compel]
  • September 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Compel]
  • August 30, 2019: [Renew]
  • August 30, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 23, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 05, 2019: [Letter]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Refund of Fees Paid Electronically]
  • July 19, 2019: [Joinder]
  • July 19, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • July 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • July 02, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Letter]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 28, 2019: [Consent Filed]
  • January 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 14, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 14, 2019: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [USCA Order]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Order]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 01, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 08, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • December 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • September 15, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2017: [Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 03, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Certify Class]
  • April 14, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 14, 2017: [Complaint]
  • April 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.