U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Wery v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 28, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Litigation Order]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 19, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 19, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order]
  • June 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 19, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 15, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 04, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 14, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.