U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00151
  • Case Name: Edmo v. Corizon Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Reconsideration]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • December 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Stay]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 02, 2022: [Writ]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [File Excess Pages]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [File Excess Pages]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Report]
  • May 26, 2020: [Letter]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 06, 2020: [Sealed Document]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2020: [Stay]
  • March 02, 2020: [Sealed Document]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • February 26, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 21, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 19, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 11, 2020: [USCA Order]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 16, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 05, 2019: [Transcript]
  • December 04, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • November 21, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 20, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 16, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 13, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • November 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 09, 2019: [Appeal Transcript]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 08, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • November 07, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • November 07, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 05, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 05, 2019: [Strike]
  • November 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 04, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • November 01, 2019: [Status Report]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • November 01, 2019: [Status Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Expedite]
  • October 31, 2019: [Stay]
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • October 21, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • October 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 11, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Status Report]
  • October 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Stay]
  • September 20, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 16, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 10, 2019: [USCA Order]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • July 10, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • July 05, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 03, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 03, 2019: [Transcript]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
  • May 31, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [USCA Order]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 09, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2019: [USCA Order]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 26, 2019: [Transcript]
  • March 22, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 19, 2019: [Status Report]
  • March 15, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 06, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • March 06, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 31, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 31, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 22, 2019: [Appeal Transcript]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 22, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 16, 2019: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • January 15, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 15, 2019: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • January 15, 2019: [Status Report]
  • January 09, 2019: [Stay]
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 03, 2019: [Litigation Order]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Proposed Findings of Fact]
  • October 26, 2018: [Trial Brief]
  • October 26, 2018: [Supplement]
  • October 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 19, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 15, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 15, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 10, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 08, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 05, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • October 05, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • October 05, 2018: [Seal]
  • October 03, 2018: [Witness List]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 28, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 28, 2018: [Seal]
  • September 28, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order]
  • September 28, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 28, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • September 24, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order to Transport]
  • September 21, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 17, 2018: [Errata]
  • September 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Protective Order]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 27, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 27, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Strike]
  • July 26, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • July 26, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • July 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 24, 2018: [Discovery]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2018: [Discovery]
  • July 03, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 12, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • June 08, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 05, 2018: [Joinder]
  • June 04, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 04, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 01, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Receipt]
  • December 06, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2017: [Joinder]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 01, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 01, 2017: [Declaration]
  • November 01, 2017: [Joinder]
  • November 01, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 01, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 30, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Order]
  • June 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 19, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 09, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 09, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 09, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 17, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 12, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.