U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00165
  • Case Name: Knezovich v. DIRECTV, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 04, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 31, 2017: [Errata]
  • August 30, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 30, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 30, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 30, 2017: [Compel]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [Status Report]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.