U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Sanchez v. County of Bonneville et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Receipt]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 30, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 24, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2018: [Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 26, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 09, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 09, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 09, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order]
  • December 22, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order]
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 28, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 28, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 15, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • May 16, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 17, 2017: [Complaint]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 17, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 17, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.