U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00168
  • Case Name: Newman et al v. Depuy, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 09, 2017: [Dismiss]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • June 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 24, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • April 21, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 21, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 18, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.