U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Oldcastle Precast, Inc. v. Concrete Accessories of Georgia, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 04, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Supplement]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order]
  • March 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 15, 2019: [Transcript]
  • March 11, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 07, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 04, 2019: [Supplement]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Errata]
  • February 20, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • February 20, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2019: [Errata]
  • February 14, 2019: [Taxation of Costs]
  • February 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 31, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 31, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 23, 2019: [Supplement]
  • January 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 10, 2019: [Supplement]
  • January 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 08, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 04, 2019: [Stipulation]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [In Limine]
  • December 28, 2018: [Errata]
  • December 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2018: [Joint Mediation Statement]
  • December 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • November 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 20, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 13, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order]
  • November 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order]
  • November 08, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order]
  • November 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 22, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 19, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 19, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 19, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • October 19, 2018: [In Limine]
  • October 19, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 16, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2018: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • May 18, 2018: [Crossclaim]
  • May 11, 2018: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • May 11, 2018: [Crossclaim]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 16, 2018: [Supplement]
  • April 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Pro Bono]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 09, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance Pro Bono/Fee Waiver]
  • April 09, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • March 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2018: [Protective Order]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • February 02, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • February 02, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • February 02, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 02, 2018: [Crossclaim]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 30, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 30, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 18, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • January 18, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • January 18, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 12, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 07, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 24, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 03, 2017: [Withdraw]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Order]
  • July 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 28, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • June 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 06, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 06, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 06, 2017: [Counterclaim]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 15, 2017: [Status Report]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • April 24, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 17, 2017: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.