U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00167
  • Case Name: Carr v. Zmuda et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Reopen Case]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • September 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Receipt]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 26, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 27, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 27, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Request]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Supplement]
  • April 09, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Request]
  • March 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 05, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 05, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 05, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 22, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 20, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 15, 2018: [Declaration]
  • February 15, 2018: [Compel]
  • February 05, 2018: [Request]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 05, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 03, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 02, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2017: [Letter]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Consolidate Cases]
  • June 26, 2017: [Consent Filed]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 18, 2017: [Complaint]
  • April 18, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 18, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.