U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00169
  • Case Name: Paz v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 28, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 28, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 18, 2017: [Writ of Mandamus]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.