U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00162
  • Case Name: Paz v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 05, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Order]
  • June 13, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 30, 2018: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Consent Filed]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 18, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.