U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00170
  • Case Name: F.V. v. Armstrong et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 08, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 01, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 01, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 29, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 01, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 12, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 11, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 08, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 18, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 18, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.