U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00171
  • Case Name: American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas v. Terra Nativa, LLP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Stipulation]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 13, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • June 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 09, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Status Report]
  • May 18, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • April 19, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 18, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 18, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.