U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00173
  • Case Name: Warren v. STELLAR SENIOR LIVING, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Dismiss]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 03, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 02, 2018: [Errata]
  • April 02, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order]
  • December 29, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 20, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 11, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 21, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 20, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 25, 2017: [Litigation Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 28, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 28, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 19, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 21, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 20, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.