U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cv-00174
  • Case Name: Buzbee v. AstraZenica Pharmaceuticals LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 07, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order CTO]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 11, 2017: [Stay]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 24, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 24, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 24, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.