U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00175
  • Case Name: Joe Hand Productions, Inc. v. Mad Creations Vapes LLC d/b/a/ Mad Creations Vapes et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of Letter of Dismissal]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 27, 2017: [Entry of Default]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order]
  • June 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 24, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 24, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.