U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00177
  • Case Name: Jones v. Spitfire Operations, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • September 08, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Status Report]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Status Report]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • April 26, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 25, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.