U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00176
  • Case Name: Demoura et al v. Benewah County Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • August 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 09, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 09, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 04, 2017: [Consent Filed]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 26, 2017: [Complaint]
  • April 26, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 26, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.