U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00418
  • Case Name: Zazzali v. DeWaay et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
  • September 27, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • September 26, 2017: [Status Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 25, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order]
  • September 21, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 19, 2017: [Sanctions]
  • September 08, 2017: [Judgment - Default]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Default Judgment]
  • September 05, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order]
  • April 26, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order]
  • April 26, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.