U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00178
  • Case Name: Torres v. Sugar-Salem School District #322 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Seal Document]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [In Limine]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 21, 2020: [Vacate]
  • July 13, 2020: [In Limine]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 11, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • February 10, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2019: [Reconsideration]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 12, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [In Limine]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • January 22, 2019: [Seal]
  • January 22, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • January 22, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 22, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 22, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 21, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • January 18, 2019: [Strike]
  • January 18, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • January 07, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 16, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 09, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order]
  • October 30, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2018: [Joinder]
  • October 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 28, 2018: [Witness List]
  • September 19, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 13, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 05, 2018: [Protective Order]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 20, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 08, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 25, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Litigation Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 24, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 12, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 06, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Status Report]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 26, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.