U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00180
  • Case Name: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Muroff et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Withdraw]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Compel]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Clarify]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Intervene]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 31, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • October 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 11, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 10, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Intervene]
  • October 01, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 24, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 10, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 07, 2018: [Statement]
  • September 06, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 06, 2018: [Certificate of Compliance]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Stay]
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Abstract Issued]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 28, 2017: [Declaration]
  • June 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Judgment - Consent]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 28, 2017: [Order]
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.