U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company v. Reeder Flying Service, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 03, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Errata]
  • November 01, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • November 01, 2017: [Disclosure Statement]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Affidavit]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • August 28, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 15, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • June 15, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 14, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
  • May 17, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 04, 2017: [Summons Issued]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.