U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00184
  • Case Name: Doe XX et al v. Boy Scouts of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 17, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order]
  • January 16, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • January 10, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 17, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • October 17, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 15, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 15, 2018: [Stipulation]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Order]
  • March 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 15, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 26, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • January 19, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • January 09, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 09, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 05, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • January 02, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 02, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 02, 2017: [Consent Filed]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Joinder]
  • July 25, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Joinder]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Sever]
  • June 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 12, 2017: [Consolidate Cases]
  • June 12, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 08, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 30, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 10, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 09, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 04, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 01, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.