U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00185
  • Case Name: Boettner v. United States
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Return Mail]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • January 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 16, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 01, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • May 01, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.