U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00186
  • Case Name: Lara v. Corizon Correctional Health Care et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • April 04, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • April 02, 2019: [Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 31, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 31, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 06, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 16, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2018: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 05, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order]
  • January 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • December 18, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 20, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 17, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 17, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order]
  • August 28, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 02, 2017: [Complaint]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 02, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 02, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.