U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00190
  • Case Name: Christensen v. Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 07, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 26, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 11, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 11, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Litigation Order]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 24, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 03, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 02, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.