U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00191
  • Case Name: Bartlett et al v. Atencio et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Statement]
  • December 01, 2017: [Status Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 27, 2017: [Status Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Status Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2017: [Judgment - Consent]
  • October 03, 2017: [Judgment Offer Accepted (Notice of Acceptance)]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 04, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • September 04, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Order]
  • August 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 12, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 11, 2017: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • July 11, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 11, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order to Transport]
  • June 15, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 25, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order to Transport]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 19, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 09, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 09, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 04, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 03, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.