U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00194
  • Case Name: Walck v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Letter]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 18, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • March 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 07, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • March 07, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 21, 2019: [Request]
  • February 19, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Default Judgment]
  • January 22, 2019: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • January 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 23, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 12, 2018: [Certificate of Compliance]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 06, 2018: [Request]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 25, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Letter]
  • March 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2018: [Request]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • January 29, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • January 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 05, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Affidavit]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2017: [Request]
  • October 17, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 03, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 20, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 20, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 15, 2017: [Supplement]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Request]
  • August 31, 2017: [Consent Filed]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Errata]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 04, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 04, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 04, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.