U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00193
  • Case Name: Contreras v. Corizon Health Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Receipt]
  • July 13, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 02, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 11, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 10, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 10, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • April 11, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 31, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 04, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 04, 2017: [Complaint]
  • May 04, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 04, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.