U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00195
  • Case Name: Pida v. City of Bonners Ferry
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 18, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 15, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [Continue]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 20, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 06, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 06, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 24, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2018: [Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 30, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 29, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • December 29, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 25, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 25, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order]
  • October 25, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 02, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 26, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • May 19, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 15, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 09, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.