U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00197
  • Case Name: Western Watersheds Project v. USDA APHIS Wildlife Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 04, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [~Util - Case Stayed]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 25, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2017: [Stay]
  • September 12, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 11, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 18, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 12, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 28, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 08, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 05, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.