U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00199
  • Case Name: Digiulio v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • October 12, 2017: [Remand to Agency]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 14, 2017: [Declaration]
  • September 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 17, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 26, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 24, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • July 24, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 10, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 10, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • May 09, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 08, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • May 08, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.