U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00200
  • Case Name: Lee v. Stoddart et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 14, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 11, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 06, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • June 06, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 05, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • June 05, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 25, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 22, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 12, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 09, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 09, 2017: [Complaint]
  • May 09, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 09, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.