U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00202
  • Case Name: Espy v. J.E. Williams Trucking, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 22, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 27, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 27, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 25, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 11, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 06, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Litigation Order]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 11, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 10, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.