U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00205
  • Case Name: The Cincinnati Casualty Company v. Industrial Ventilation, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 05, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Stipulation]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order]
  • October 10, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 04, 2018: [Stipulation]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 02, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 04, 2018: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 23, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2018: [Strike]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 24, 2018: [Statement]
  • April 24, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 24, 2018: [Seal]
  • April 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Stipulation]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 19, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 18, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • January 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Declaration]
  • November 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 10, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 03, 2017: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 20, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • October 20, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 15, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • September 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 08, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 15, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 11, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 10, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 10, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 05, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 15, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 13, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 08, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 08, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order]
  • June 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 05, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 16, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 11, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • May 10, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 10, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.