U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00204
  • Case Name: Ordes et al v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order CTO]
  • May 16, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • May 10, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 10, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.