U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00207
  • Case Name: Corral v. Idaho Department of Correction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Letter]
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to Amend]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 23, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 06, 2018: [Dismiss]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 31, 2017: [Receipt]
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 11, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 11, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 11, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.