U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00206
  • Case Name: Western Watersheds Project et al v. USDA APHIS Wildlife Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • September 03, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Entry of Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Errata]
  • December 31, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order]
  • November 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 28, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • November 07, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Errata]
  • October 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 01, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 25, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 22, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 16, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Supplement]
  • January 26, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 25, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 25, 2018: [Intervene]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 11, 2017: [Consent Filed]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order]
  • August 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Statement]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 14, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 11, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 11, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.