U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:98-cv-00240
  • Case Name: Row v. Miller et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • October 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 06, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Stay]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Stay]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • May 28, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • May 28, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: [Errata]
  • September 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • September 07, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 05, 2018: [Strike]
  • September 04, 2018: [Strike]
  • September 04, 2018: [Response (generic)]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 31, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 25, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 07, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 12, 2017: [Errata]
  • December 11, 2017: [Supplement]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • October 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 01, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • August 01, 2017: [Transcript]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 26, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 20, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 09, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 09, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 08, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 07, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 07, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 07, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 31, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 31, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • May 30, 2017: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • May 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 25, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 25, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • May 24, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • May 23, 2017: [Witness List]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 18, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 15, 2017: [Exclude]
  • May 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 15, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • May 15, 2017: [In Limine]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.