U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00208
  • Case Name: Savage v. Heath
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 05, 2018: [Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 12, 2017: [Complaint]
  • May 12, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 12, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 12, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.