U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00209
  • Case Name: Liechty v. FBI et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Return Mail]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 15, 2017: [Complaint]
  • May 15, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.