U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00212
  • Case Name: Duvenhage et al v. United States Citizen and Immigration Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 14, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 05, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 05, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 05, 2017: [Status Conference]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • June 28, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 28, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 28, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 23, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 16, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.