U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Owens v. Idaho Real Estate Commission, the Staff of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Litigation Order]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order]
  • September 29, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 29, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • September 27, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order]
  • August 10, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 08, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 07, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 19, 2017: [Summons Reissued]
  • June 14, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 17, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 16, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.