U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00210
  • Case Name: Richmond v. Garcia et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • August 03, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • June 12, 2018: [Return Mail]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order]
  • May 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 01, 2017: [Consent Filed]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 16, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • May 16, 2017: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.